THE THOMAS PETER NAYLOR FUND
Charity number: 259953
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established to make grants for charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 19 November 1969: Standard registration
- 12 April 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 12 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1003664 ADAM C I NAYLOR CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Investment
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.47k | £5.11k | £217.63k | £88.61k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.09k | £3.65k | £1.63k | £494.90k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 298 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 298 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST JUNE 1969
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE BODIES, INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNRESTRICTED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window