THE CHARLTON SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society runs a full lecture and social programme throughout the year aimed at members and other residents. It also promotes its objectives on conservation, environment and the community fabric through making representations, supporting projects and policies on a wide range of issues to support Charlton's heritage, environment and quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Greenwich
Governance
- 17 December 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Dodson | Chair | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Councillor David Llewellyn Gardner | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.78k | £5.81k | £2.66k | £2.01k | £3.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.48k | £2.43k | £3.82k | £2.69k | £2.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 September 2023 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2022 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD OCTOBER 1969
Charitable objects
A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE AREA OF THE VILLAGE AND ITS SURROUNDINGS.B) TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST.C) TO GATHER INFORMATION ABOUT PROPOSALS BY LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND PRIVATE INTERESTS WHICH WOULD ALTER THE CHARACTER OF CHARLTON.D) TO PURSUE THESE ENDS BY MEANS OF MEETINGS, EXHIBITIONS LECTURES, AND PROMOTION OF SCHEMES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
CHARLTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 Charlton Lane
LONDON
SE7 8RQ
- Phone:
- 07463996285
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window