Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH, BRIGHTLINGSEA

Charity Number: 260143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.75k £11.06k £8.67k £89.43k £21.66k
Total expenditure £13.41k £7.11k £6.53k £83.33k £11.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A