Financial history CROYDON NATURAL HISTORY AND SCIENTIFIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 260739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.82k £8.43k £62.59k £273.60k £89.60k
Total expenditure £15.37k £8.84k £12.11k £41.10k £29.42k
Income from government contracts £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A £300 N/A