Trustees CROYDON NATURAL HISTORY AND SCIENTIFIC SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity Number: 260739

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLE ANN ROBERTS | Chair | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Elizabeth Gibbons | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Swallow | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Malarkey | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Roy Dennison | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jorn Gayelord Cooper | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Esther Mann | Trustee | 14 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Armstrong Hart | Trustee | 14 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jacqueline Norton Buttrey | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY SKRZYPCZYK | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HICKMAN | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN GARRYK PAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA JANICE HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.