THE LYME REGIS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society works to safeguard and add to the natural and architectural beauty of Lyme Regis and to promote interest in the towns cultural life and history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 July 1970: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER PATRICIA BRITTON | Chair | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Allan Swannell | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL FURLEY MELLOR | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Nicholls | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Jean Doney | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Mrs Vicki Dizon | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Clement Coe | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr Jim Bragg | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.75k | £1.53k | £1.89k | £2.30k | £2.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.33k | £1.86k | £1.07k | £2.23k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 FEBRUARY 1970 AS AMENDED 14 MARCH 1972, 12 MARCH 1974, 11 OCTOBER 1976 AND 29 JANUARY 2010 as amended on 21 Sep 2021 as amended on 26 Apr 2022 as amended on 26 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO SAFEGUARD AND ADD TO THE NATURAL AND ARCHITECTURAL BEAUTY OF LYME REGIS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS CIVIC REQUIREMENTS. 2. PROMOTE INTEREST IN ITS LIFE AND HISTORY.
Area of benefit
LYME REGIS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Charmouth Close
LYME REGIS
Dorset
DT7 3DJ
- Phone:
- 01297792797
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window