THE HOSTEL OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold and maintain Almshouse premises in perpetuity for the use of the aged poor without distinction of sex, class or creed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 22 July 1970: Standard registration
- 21 July 1994: Removed
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Leslie Tyler | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARY ODDI | Trustee | 21 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.29k | £21.52k | £26.51k | £27.46k | £29.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.05k | £5.73k | £6.53k | £10.05k | £29.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 JUNE 1935, AS AMENDED ON THE 21ST MARCH 1994 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR THE USE OF THE AGED POOR WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, CLASS OR CREED
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FERNHURST
Linked charities
- 22 July 1970 : Standard registration
- 21 July 1994 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brown Hylda
Hindhead Road
Haslemere
GU27 1LR
- Phone:
- 01428645771
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window