Britten Pears Arts

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Artistic programming - concerts at Snape Concert Hall and other locations; Britten-Pears Young Artist Programme - performance driven masterclasses; Aldeburgh Residencies - development for established musicians; Aldeburgh Young Musicians - creative and performing projects for exceptional musicians aged 8 and 18; Learning and Inclusion - engagement with the local community on arts-based projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£18,397,000
Donations and legacies | £9.60m | |
Charitable activities | £1.66m | |
Other trading activities | £6.72m | |
Investments | £413.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£12,827,000
Raising funds | £550.00k | |
Charitable activities | £6.85m | |
Other | £5.43m |
£632,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,503,835 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.98m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.85m | |
Retained for future use | £5.57m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.98m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.85m | |
Retained for future use | £6.20m |
People

169 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
156 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- ALDEBURGH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- ALDEBURGH MUSIC (Previous name)
- ALDEBURGH PRODUCTIONS (Previous name)
- SNAPE MALTINGS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir SIMON CHRISTOPHER TOWNSEND ROBEY | Chair |
|
||||||
David Andrew Leo Clasen | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Comben | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Gregory | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Xerxes Mazda | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lady Sarah Younger | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Christopher Neil Swift | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Jamie Njoku-Goodwin | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Marie Christine Mallinson | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mary Faulder | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Laura Wade-Gery | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janis Elizabeth Susskind | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
ALASDAIR WILSON ROBERTSON TAIT | Trustee |
|
||||||
SARAH ANNE ZINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Andrew Robbie | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.64m | £9.26m | £11.35m | £12.78m | £18.40m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.95m | £8.94m | £11.11m | £13.30m | £12.83m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £73.00k | £3.51m | £2.03m | £1.54m | £1.50m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.83m | £4.33m | £3.55m | £4.37m | £9.60m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £6.90m | £3.37m | £6.65m | £6.64m | £6.72m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.53m | £275.00k | £854.00k | £1.47m | £1.66m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00m | |
|
Income - Investment | £279.00k | £228.00k | £251.00k | £296.00k | £413.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £110.00k | £1.05m | £41.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £808.00k | £917.00k | £52.00k | £86.00k | £283.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.16m | £4.16m | £5.43m | £7.48m | £6.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £383.00k | £511.00k | £563.00k | £544.00k | £550.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £133.00k | £60.00k | £62.00k | £57.00k | £48.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £5.40m | £4.27m | £5.13m | £5.27m | £5.43m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £46.75m | £45.70m | £46.00m | £46.39m | £46.21m | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.34m | £6.91m | £7.27m | £7.18m | £12.82m | |
|
Other assets | £6.67m | £6.10m | £7.74m | £6.63m | £7.46m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.79m | £867.00k | £2.17m | £1.75m | £2.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAY 1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 SEP 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 OCT 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 SEP 1994 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 MAR 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 MAY 2020 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 MAY 2020 as amended on 16 Jul 2022 as amended on 19 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND CRAFTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DRAMA, DANCING, MIME, PAINTING, SCULPTURE AND GRAPHIC ARTS, AND LITERATURE AND POETRY, AND TO EXTEND AND INCREASE THE APPRECIATION, KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARTS AND CRAFTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS; 2) TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE OF THE WORKS OF BENJAMIN BRITTEN AND PETER PEARS; 3) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE MUSICAL, HISTORICAL AND CULTURAL LEGACIES OF BENJAMIN BRITTEN AND PETER PEARS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE AND ENHANCEMENT OF THEIR PROPERTIES AND COLLECTIONS; 4) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN MATTERS RELATED TO PEACE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND 5) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT OR PURPOSE AND TO ENGAGE IN ANY FIELD OF CHARITABLE GRANT-MAKING ACTIVITY PERMITTED BY ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Britten Pears Arts
SNAPE MALTINGS CONCERT HALL
SNAPE BRIDGE
SNAPE
SAXMUNDHAM
IP17 1SP
- Phone:
- 01728687100
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window