OPERA RARA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Opera Rara widens the operatic repertoire and develops artistic talent by restoring,recording, performing and promiting rare and forgotten works from the 19th and 20th centuries. We spend our charitable income on the execution of recording projects and on the production of concerts while nurturing the current and next generation of remarkable singers, as we have done since 1970.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£895,866
Donations and legacies | £714.43k | |
Charitable activities | £167.31k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £14.13k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£851,621
Raising funds | £73.73k | |
Charitable activities | £777.89k | |
Other | £0 |
£14,127 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £73.73k | |
Charitable expenditure | £777.89k | |
Retained for future use | £44.25k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £73.73k | |
Charitable expenditure | £777.89k | |
Retained for future use | £58.37k |
People

5 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 August 1970: Standard registration
- OPERA RARA LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES ALEXANDER | Chair | 01 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Anthony Peter Freud OBE | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Bruce Mauleverer KC | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Philip William Eisenbeiss | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Adolfo Luigi Laurenti | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Terence Rhodes Sinclair | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
NICHOLAS JAMES THOMAS | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|||||||||
ALISON NICOL optional | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
SIMON ANTHONY MORTIMORE KC | Trustee | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
ISLEE OLIVA SALINAS | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Glenn Charles Hurstfield | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £353.80k | £930.42k | £732.03k | £710.26k | £895.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £696.52k | £339.18k | £546.04k | £913.93k | £851.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £838.31k | £632.10k | £560.46k | £714.43k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £91.55k | £98.41k | £141.57k | £167.31k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £560 | £1.52k | £8.22k | £14.13k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £270.82k | £465.57k | £848.53k | £777.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £68.35k | £80.47k | £65.40k | £73.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £47.13k | £8.53k | £0 | £13.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £3.42k | £2.31k | £2.09k | £2.81k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £977.01k | £1.09m | £848.65k | £923.31k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £285.34k | £211.43k | £173.34k | £204.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19TH JUNE 1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1998, 1ST SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 16TH MAY 2001. as amended on 14 Dec 2020 as amended on 22 Jun 2024 as amended on 22 Jun 2024 as amended on 22 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
The Charity?s objects are specifically restricted to the following: To advance the education of the public by encouraging and promoting the study of operatic art and in particular the lesser-known works of operatic art through research, making recordings for sale and distribution to the public and performance in public concerts and by such other activities as the trustees shall think fit; To further the education of young singers and artists by providing opportunities to partake in operatic and orchestral performances and concerts; To encourage and support for the public benefit all art forms, particularly but not exclusively involving operatic art and other forms of music, including other cultural and educational activities in order to make these more accessible to the public; and To benefit any charity and to further any purposes in the operatic sector which are charitable in accordance with the laws of England and Wales. This provision may be amended by special resolution but only with the prior written consent of the Commission.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Studio 11 Cloisters House
8 Battersea Park Road
London
SW8 4BG
- Phone:
- 02076132858
- Email:
- info@opera-rara.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window