THE STANIER 8F LOCOMOTIVE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation in working order of Ex LMS Stanier 8F steam locomotive 48773/8233
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 November 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY NOEL RYAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicola Glover | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Griffith Jones | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PEDDER | Trustee | 21 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICHARD MCINTOSH | Trustee |
|
||||||
TERENCE GODFREY BARRIE DONLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RODNEY WILLIAM DAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT GEORGE NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.73k | £14.10k | £9.73k | £9.86k | £24.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.14k | £9.84k | £7.43k | £2.76k | £14.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ATRICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH JUNE 1970
Charitable objects
TO ACQUIRE, PROTECT AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND MAINTAIN IN WORKING ORDER THE STEAM LOCOMOTIVE NO.48773 AND ANY LOCOMOTIVE, ROLLING STOCK OR OTHER EQUIPMENT WHETHER FIXED OR MOVABLE OF WHATEVER NATURE CONNECTED WITH THE OPERATION OFA RAILWAY OR FORMERLY BELONGING TO A RAILWAY OPERATING COMPANY OR UNDERTAKING. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 3 AND 4 OF MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 WREXHAM CLOSE
CALLANDS
WARRINGTON
WA5 9RL
- Phone:
- 01992442260
- Email:
- blackeight8f@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window