Financial history The Rotary Club of Senlac St Leonards Samaritan Fund

Charity number: 261818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.74k £4.95k £6.84k £17.24k £6.68k
Total expenditure £17.91k £5.16k £9.59k £11.23k £8.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A