Financial history GATESHEAD YESHIVA ALUMNI LIMITED

Charity number: 261875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £73.10k £123.37k £298.95k £160.42k £86.99k
Total expenditure £131.43k £85.89k £116.00k £190.11k £128.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A