BECKENHAM CHORALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The study and practice of choral music in order to foster the public knowledge of such music by means of public performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 21 May 1971: Standard registration
- 17 March 2023: Funds received from 289259 THE JUBILATE CHOIR
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Patricia Moody | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Peter Lock | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bromley | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Honor Janet Messeder | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Ullmann | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Owens Burrell | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jo Easter | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANNE CATHERINE MORAN | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.67k | £9.85k | £21.14k | £30.24k | £34.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.35k | £7.22k | £26.82k | £32.66k | £36.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 May 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31/10/1972 AS AMENDED ON 14/10/2008 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 9
Briary Lodge
56 The Avenue
BECKENHAM
Kent
BR3 5ES
- Phone:
- 02086636453
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window