THE SHELL PENSIONERS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pensioners in need of assistance are identified by Pensioner Programme Officer and a proposal is made to the Trustees as to how the Charity may assist the Pensioner. The Trustees may make a grant or an interest free loan. The latter enables the Charity's funds to be recycled and assist other Pensioners in due course.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 March 1971: Standard registration
- 18 December 2014: Funds received from 286548 THE SHELL-MEX AND B P PENSIONERS BENEVOLENCE ASSOC...
- SPBA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roy Dennis Waight | Chair | 06 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Stewart Welsford Pain | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|||||
KAREN SAYWELL | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Oxspring | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
STUART TESTER | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN LEWIS | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|||||
VERONICA ALISON CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARGARET SPRINGETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ALISON NANCARROW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £374.25k | £231.36k | £249.48k | £249.93k | £244.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.82k | £223.88k | £170.50k | £296.99k | £281.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTITON ADOPTED THE 16TH DECEMBER 1970 AS AMENDED ON THE 10TH MAY 1972, 27TH OCTOBER 1987, AND 19TH MAY 1993
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE SHELL PENSIONERS ASSOCIATION AND THE WIVES,WIDOWS, CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shell Pensioners Benevolent Association
Shell Centre
london
SE1 7NA
- Phone:
- 02079345131
- Email:
- ken.k.sleat@shell.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window