SS GREAT BRITAIN TRUST

Charity number: 262158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To preserve the ship, ss Great Britain, and her building dock for all time for the public benefit of all, and to place the same upon public display as a museum for the enhancement of the public understanding and appreciation of her social, commercial and technological context and significance.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City
  • Somerset
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SS "GREAT BRITAIN" PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
  • SS GREAT BRITAIN PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Jones Chair 23 October 2023
None on record
Georgina Verity Power Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Lady Sarah Porritt CBE Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Muir Macdonald Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Emma Elizabeth Millington Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Edward John Rowberry Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Caroline-Jane Duckworth Trustee 21 January 2021
ST STEPHEN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
EDMONDS AND COLES SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
Kelvin John Blake Trustee 02 November 2019
Bristol City Robins Foundation
Received: On time
Lois Patricia Golding Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
SAM MULLINS Trustee 14 July 2014
THE MUSEUM PRIZE
Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £5.31m £3.31m £3.70m £3.71m £5.55m
Total expenditure £6.14m £4.11m £4.44m £4.71m £6.44m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £210.00k £1.04m £1.39m £214.00k £770.13k
Income - Donations and legacies £585.91k £2.28m £1.83m £719.85k £1.12m
Income - Other trading activities £2.01m £243.15k £335.74k £584.15k £1.83m
Income - Charitable activities £2.50m £646.01k £1.38m £2.23m £2.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £205.74k £144.57k £155.32k £173.01k £201.95k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £9.50k £106.51k £54.09k £170.61k £30.45k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.00m £3.31m £3.65m £3.73m £4.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £117.95k £198.71k £190.41k £200.41k £238.16k
Expenditure - Governance £35.91k £13.43k £38.91k £33.63k £47.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £33.89k £30.93k £26.48k £33.54k £33.33k
Expenditure - Other £2.02m £601.39k £599.00k £782.39k £1.93m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Own use assets £13.99m £13.24m £12.51m £11.81m £11.42m
Long-term investments £7.12m £6.89m £7.32m £7.07m £7.02m
Other assets £1.47m £1.42m £1.54m £1.19m £788.18k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £532.82k £517.40k £658.85k £572.52k £545.89k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 19 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 25 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 25 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 26 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 26 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 14 DECEMBER 2007 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 24 JANUARY 2008.
Charitable objects
THE CORPORATE TRUSTEE MUST HOLD THE PROPERTY OF THE ENDOWMENT TRUST ON TRUST FOR AND APPLY THE INCOME OF THE ENDOWMENT TRUST IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ("THE OBJECTS"):- A) TO ACQUIRE, TRANSPORT, REBUILD, RESTORE AND FIT OUT THE SS GREAT BRITAIN TO PRESERVE THE SAME FOR ALL TIME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS A SHIP OF HISTORIC INTEREST AND TO PLACE THE SAME UPON PUBLIC DISPLAY; AND B) TO INCREASE THE SUM OF PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF MARITIME AND INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE, AND MARITIME ARCHAEOLOGY AND SOCIAL HISTORY, AND TO COLLECT IN ANY MANNER WHATSOEVER, PRESERVE, AND MAKE ACCESSIBLE AS A MUSEUM ARTEFACTS AND SPECIMENS THAT DEMONSTRATE AND REFLECT A TANGIBLE LINK WITH THE PAST AND PRESENT OF MARITIME AND INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE, AND MARITIME ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BRISTOL
Registration history
  • 29 January 2008 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
GREAT WESTERN DOCK
GAS FERRY ROAD
BRISTOL
BS1 6TY
Phone:
01179260680