THE M B RECKITT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A grant-giving trust that funds projects concerned with Christian social thought and action. An organization that takes initiatives and holds consultations on topics of Christian and social concern. The aim of the Trust is to promote researches and activities that evaluate and develop social structures, processes and attitudes in order to release energies for change, from the perspective of Christ
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 May 1971: Standard registration
- THE CHRISTENDOM TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL PAUL WAKELIN | Chair | 18 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Andrew Jennings | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIONNE GRAVESANDE | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|||||
THE REV'D DR INDERJIT BHOGAL | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan O'Brien | Trustee | 13 December 2013 |
|
|||||
REV'D ALYSON PEBERDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rt Revd Dr Michael Ipgrave | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROSEMARY VICTORIA WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL ALAN O'CONNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.68k | £6.85k | £6.00k | £6.33k | £6.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.80k | £12.65k | £22.63k | £17.19k | £19.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 JANUARY 1971 AND ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 22 NOVEMBER 2004, AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN MEMORANDUM DATED 16 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND OF CHRISTIAN KNOWLEDGE AMONG MEN AND WOMEN OF ALL CLASSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 GROVE AVENUE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 1ND
- Phone:
- 01912405209
- Email:
- mbreckitttrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window