DEVEREUX HOUSE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds in order to supplement the service provided by Devereux House for the health, welfare and comfort of the residents and daycare visitors therein.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 06 May 1971: Standard registration
- 11 July 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 11 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1108054 FARNBOROUGH & COVE WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL TRUST LTD
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF FARNBOROUGH AND COVE WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.31k | £3.03k | £1.59k | £3.12k | £3.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.48k | £2.19k | £1.45k | £1.78k | £3.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 22 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 03 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND OCTOBER 1969 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CLIENTS OF THE FORMER FARNBOROUGH & COVE WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NOW KNOWN AS "DEVEREUX HOUSE" WHO RESIDE AT OR WHO ARE DAY CARE VISITORS WHO ARE DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID DEVEREUX HOUSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window