Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF TWICKENHAM TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 262573
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.63k £30.12k £20.33k £9.35k £13.17k
Total expenditure £16.19k £28.49k £20.44k £8.87k £10.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A