Financial history CHURCH HALL

Charity Number: 262805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.05k £3.79k £4.05k £4.22k £4.28k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £6.50k £5.40k £7.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A