PLUMSTEAD ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 263259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide Accommodation/Housing to persons over the age of 55 years who are in need, hardship or distess in the following oreder of priority. (i) persons resident in area of benefit (Plumstead) (ii) persons resident in the London Borough of Greenwich Such charitable purposes for the benefit of the residents as the trusteed decide

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £116,280
Total expenditure: £34,225

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANGUS BEARN Chair
None on record
Ben Williams Trustee 10 August 2022
None on record
Jeremy Forty Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Jennifer Ball Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Allan Nichols Trustee 28 January 2015
None on record
Michael MacCarthy Trustee 09 October 2013
None on record
BARBARA HARRIS Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VEDAST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £114.76k £130.77k £110.65k £116.39k £116.28k
Total expenditure £100.48k £92.10k £95.36k £53.60k £34.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 10 MARCH 1936
Charitable objects
IN THE PAYMENT OF WEEKLY ALLOWANCES, BEING IN NO CASE, EXCEPT WITH THE APPROYAL OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS, LESS IN VALUE THAN 2S.6D. A WEEK OR MORE THAN 7S.6D. A WEEK TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF PLUMSTEAD AND NOT IN RECEIPT OF POOR-LAW RELIEF OTHER THAN MEDICAL RELIEF AND WHO HAVE ATTAINED THE AGE OF 60YEARS AND BECOME WHOLLY OR IN PART UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES BY THEIR OWN EXERTIONS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF PLUMSTEAD
Registration history
  • 13 January 1972 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
35 DAWSON DRIVE
SWANLEY
BR8 7PN
Phone:
07736433343
Website:

No information available