LORAINE CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the Trust is the advancement of the Christian faith. This object may be fulfilled [but not necessarily exclusively so] by providing care and comfort of elderly or disabled people especially such as belong to the "Household of Faith" (Gal.6:10) including providing a home for them. The Trust may also engage in other charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 05 February 1972: Standard registration
- LCT (Working name)
- LORAINE CHRISTIAN TRUST (Working name)
- DEVON ASSEMBLIES EVENTIDE HOME (Previous name)
- LORAINE CHRISTIAN RETIREMENT HOME (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE REGINALD BARTLETT | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Karen Silcox | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|||||||||
DAVID MARTIN BALL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.21k | £19.61k | £13.69k | £13.91k | £14.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.70k | £15.58k | £10.50k | £10.30k | £22.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 1970 AND AMENDED 1 JANUARY 2002 AND 1 MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 1 THIS OBJECT MAY BE FULFILLED [BUT NOT NECESSARILY EXCLUSIVELY SO] BY PROVIDING CARE AND COMFORT TO ELDERLY OR DISABLED PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY SUCH AS BELONG TO THE "HOUSEHOLD OF FAITH" (GAL.6.10),INCLUDING PROVIDING A HOME FOR THEM 2 THE TRUST MAY ALSO ENGAGE IN ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4B Langdon Lane
Galmpton
BRIXHAM
Devon
TQ5 0PG
- Phone:
- 07817633629
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window