THE SEXTON'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Upkeep & repair of one private house in return for Sexton's duties at Lambourn Parish Church or if there be no sexton to make grants from funds and rents,( after provisions for repairs and maintenance of the property and any other liabilities) to Lambourn PCC for activities normally undertaken by a sexton as set out in the revision to the trust deed January 2022
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 06 April 1972: Standard registration
- LAMBOURN VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS SEXTONS CHARITY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Penelope Mary Honey | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Juliette Melinda Mintern | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.85k | £1.86k | £1.86k | £1.91k | £5.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £756 | £4.82k | £304 | £5.80k | £6.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 NOVEMBER 1938 as amended on 18 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
1. COTTAGE AND GARDEN TO BE OCCUPIED BY THE SEXTON FOR THE TIME BEING OF LAMBOURN. 2. THE NET INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SEXTON FOR THE TIME BEING OF LAMBOURN, OR, IF THERE IS NO SUCH SEXTON, TO THE PERSON PERFORMING THE DUTIES OF THE SEXTON OF LAMBOURN.
Area of benefit
LAMBOURN
Contact information
- Address:
-
SETTON HOUSE
GREENWAYS
LAMBOURN
HUNGERFORD
RG17 7LE
- Phone:
- 07831498259
- Email:
- bruceaelaurie@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window