THE AUBREY BARKER FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the study of and the acquisition and dissemination of knowledge and skill in the disciplines of land surveying, quantity surveying and land economy and in particular of promoting the same in developing countries in which in the opinion of the trustees the promotion of the same would be of especial benefit to the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cameroon
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
Governance
- 02 June 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iain Greenway | Chair | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grazyna Wiejak-Roy | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Olusegun Ajanlekoko | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Neate | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Mason | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Fairlie | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ainoriza Mohd Aini PhD | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Waldy | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
TONY CHASE FRICS | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR IAN DOWMAN | Trustee | 16 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EVELYN HARRY HAYWARD BSC, FRICS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR CHRIS LITTLE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.02k | £12.04k | £12.37k | £0 | £16.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.94k | £544 | £604 | £14.11k | £1.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH MARCH 1972
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE STUDY OF AND THE ACQUISITION AND DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE AND SKILL IN THE DISCIPLINES OF LAND SURVEYING, QUANTITY SURVEYING AND LAND ECONOMY AND IN PARTICULAR OF PROMOTING THE SAME IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES, THAT IS TO SAY, COUNTRIES IN WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES THE PROMOTION OF THE SAME WOULD BE OF ESPECIAL BENEFIT TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thackray Williams
15-17 London Road
BROMLEY
BR1 1DE
- Phone:
- 01223 847355
- Email:
- i.dowman@ucl.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window