FACULTY OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE ROYAL COLLEGES OF PHYSICIANS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the advancement of education in public health, to develop public health with a view to maintaining the highest possible standards of professional competence and practice and to act as an authoritative body for the purpose of consultation in matters of educational or public interest concerning public health
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,339,784
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.27m | |
Other trading activities | £39.37k | |
Investments | £28.34k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,090,728
Raising funds | £13.14k | |
Charitable activities | £2.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£85,945 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £13.14k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.08m | |
Retained for future use | £249.06k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £13.14k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.08m | |
Retained for future use | £335.00k |
People

19 Employee(s)
28 Trustee(s)
350 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 July 1983: Standard registration
- 03 October 1995: Removed
- FACULTY OF COMMUNITY MEDICINE (Previous name)
- JOINT FACULTY OF PUBLIC HEALTH MEDICINE OF THE ROYAL COLLEGES OF PHYSICIANS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM (Previous name)
- JOINT FACULTY OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE ROYAL COLLEGES OF PHYSICIANS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Samuel Tweed MFPH | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Mary Mason FFPH | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Irfan Ghani FFPH | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Daniels FFPH | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanne Mary McClean MFPH | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aimee Stimpson FFPH | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Harald Roderick Rutter | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gerard John Waldron FFPH | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Harvey MFPH | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Daszkiewicz FFPH | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Christina Anne Gray FFPH | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Abiba Mbema FFPH | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Dee FFPH | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anjum Memon FFPH | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zafar Iqbal FFPH | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fu-Meng Khaw FFPH | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kevin Andrew Fenton | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Linda Bauld | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Lorna Jane Willocks FFPH | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Edward Battersby | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helene Gweneth Claire Denness | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Sullivan | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Anne Bromley | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul William Johnstone | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jane Flowers | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samia Latif | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christopher John Packham | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ellis Friedman | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00m | £1.75m | £2.07m | £2.12m | £2.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.82m | £1.53m | £1.67m | £1.96m | £2.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £33.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £8.05k | £0 | £8.01k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £12.80k | £9.63k | £19.23k | £21.14k | £39.37k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.94m | £1.71m | £2.02m | £2.08m | £2.27m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £32.65k | £22.74k | £21.97k | £21.93k | £28.34k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.80m | £1.52m | £1.66m | £1.95m | £2.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £11.07k | £10.20k | £13.08k | £12.54k | £13.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £81.20k | £43.11k | £46.14k | £95.40k | £79.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £11.07k | £10.20k | £13.08k | £12.54k | £13.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £51.19k | £36.54k | £21.89k | £7.25k | £158.47k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.32m | £1.42m | £1.57m | £1.59m | £1.66m | |
|
Other assets | £654.47k | £739.21k | £1.39m | £1.22m | £1.45m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £403.86k | £341.39k | £564.24k | £510.31k | £635.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
STANDING ORDERS ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1972 AS AMENDED 8 APRIL 1976, 26 JUNE 1980, 17 JUNE 1982, 3RD JULY 1986, 8 DECEMBER 1989 AND 27 JUNE 1991, 2ND JULY 1992, 29 JUNE 1995, 4 JULY 2000 AND 25 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED 3 MAY 2006 25 NOVEMBER 2014 as amended on 30 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF PUBLIC HEALTH MEDICINE. B) TO DEVELOP PUBLIC HEALTH MEDICINE WITH A VIEW TO MAINTAINING THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL COMPETENCE AND PRACTICE AND TO ACT AS AN AUTHORITATIVE BODY FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONSULTATION IN MATTERS OF EDUCATIONAL OR PUBLIC INTEREST CONCERNING PUBLIC HEALTH MEDICINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 14 July 1983 : Standard registration
- 03 October 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
FACULTY OF PUBLIC HEALTH
4 ST. ANDREWS PLACE
LONDON
NW1 4LB
- Phone:
- 02036961467
- Email:
- finance@fph.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window