MRS EDITH ELLEN HARRIS WILL TRUST

Charity number: 263945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To pay the income of the trust to the Christian Science Board of Directors of the Mother Church the First Church of Christ Scientist in Boston Massachusetts to be used in Great Britain for the promotion and extension of the religion of Christian Science as taught by Mary Baker Eddy in the Christian Science text book Science and Health with key to the Scriptures.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 02 April 2024

Total income: £46,045
Total expenditure: £60,131

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHARITY OF EDITH ELLEN HARRIS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNN NELIGAN Chair 12 July 2016
THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE TRUST IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
LUDLOW TRUST CO LTD Trustee 14 February 2022
THE CURRAN FAMILY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LOLLIPOP FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ASHLA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BASCOMBE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARGARET ROSEMARY HARGRAVE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
STUART MCCONACHIE GAULD AND PAULINE MAY GAULD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE STANLEY AND LORNA GRAVES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/04/2020 02/04/2021 02/04/2022 02/04/2023 02/04/2024
Total gross income £38.67k £26.07k £27.28k £33.26k £46.05k
Total expenditure £63.76k £49.47k £57.97k £40.96k £60.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 April 2024 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2024 02 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 April 2022 14 February 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2022 14 February 2023 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 April 2021 03 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2021 03 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ludlow Trust Company Limited
First Floor
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
Bristol
BS2 0JJ
Phone:
0117 313 8200
Website:

No information available