GLOUCESTER CIVIC TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY OF THE CHARITY IS THAT OF AN EDUCATIONAL AND PRESERVATION TRUST.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 November 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn White | Chair | 18 April 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Graham George Howell | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||
David Burley | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Mark Nigel Medland | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Anthony James Conder | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Angela Elizabeth Ellen Currier-Teal | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rosemary McDowall | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Elizabeth Jean Williams | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
COLIN JOSEPH NYLAND | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Gareth Christopher Jayne | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Emily Clare Gibbon | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Yolanda Russo | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Marc Richard Waters | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
IAN HATTON | Trustee | 03 October 1997 |
|
|||||||||
ROBERT VERNON MORRIS | Trustee | 03 October 1972 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.95k | £45.31k | £92.25k | £171.45k | £157.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.31k | £40.57k | £84.32k | £200.33k | £182.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.11k | £22.36k | £26.77k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH OCTOBER 1972 as amended on 14 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
The company is established for the public benefit for the following purposes in the area comprising City of Gloucester, which area shall hereinafter be referred to as “the area of benefit”: (a) to stimulate public interest in the area of benefit and make available community and educational resources; (b) to promote high standards of planning and architecture in the area of benefit; (c) to secure the preservation, protection, development, and improvement of features of historic or public interest in the area of benefit; (d) to operate museums, heritage centres and exhibition spaces, with associated retail facilities and to hold collections and assets; (e) to make such arrangements as are necessary to enable the public to view and enjoy any buildings, land, exhibitions or collections (whether free or at a charge); (f) by publishing books or pamphlets or in other appropriate manner to make known to the public the existence of such buildings, land, exhibitions or collections.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bishop Hooper House
99-103 Westgate Street
GLOUCESTER
GL1 2PG
- Phone:
- 01452207101
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window