Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH ANTIQUE DEALERS' ASSOCIATION LIMITED CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 264856
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 March 2025 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 02 March 2025 306 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 25 August 2023 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 25 August 2023 117 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 February 2023 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 23 February 2023 299 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 March 2022 325 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 21 March 2022 325 days late Download Open in new window