Financial history THE BRITISH ANTIQUE DEALERS' ASSOCIATION LIMITED CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 264856
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £41.55k £34.53k £29.74k £31.71k £36.31k
Total expenditure £44.02k £33.70k £25.28k £35.90k £38.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A