Accounts and annual returns BRITISH SOCIETY FOR THE HISTORY OF PHARMACY

Charity number: 264962
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 31 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 23 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 05 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required