Financial history LEE STREET CHAPEL FUND

Charity Number: 265019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.36k £2.32k £2.92k £2.94k £3.64k
Total expenditure £936 £3.08k £372 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A