ITZCHOK MEYER CYMERMAN TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 265090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity makes grants to institutions and other charities both in England and abroad

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Hackney
  • Haringey
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • I M C TRUST LTD (Working name)
  • IMC TRUST (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael David Cymerman Trustee 20 November 2018
THE M D AND S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 83 days late
CANONSTATES LIMITED
Received: On time
ADENFIRST LIMITED
Received: On time
Sylvia Cymerman Trustee 20 November 2018
THE M D AND S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 83 days late
CANONSTATES LIMITED
Received: On time
ADENFIRST LIMITED
Received: On time
BERNARD HOFFMAN Trustee 07 April 2017
None on record
IAN HEITNER Trustee 12 January 2012
RUSSIAN IMMIGRANT AID FUND LIMITED
Received: On time
AGUDAS ISRAEL ORGANISATION OF GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
CANONSTATES LIMITED
Received: On time
COLEL POLEN KUPATH RAMBAN LIMITED
Received: On time
TRUEMART LIMITED
Received: On time
BETH ABRAHAM SYNAGOGUE LIMITED
Received: On time
ADENFIRST LIMITED
Received: On time
LEONARD HARRY BONDI Trustee 04 May 2011
None on record
SARA HEITNER Trustee
TRUEMART LIMITED
Received: On time
MRS H F BONDI Trustee
CANONSTATES LIMITED
Received: On time
ADENFIRST LIMITED
Received: On time
DENCOMMON LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.46m £1.63m £1.72m £2.26m £2.61m
Total expenditure £1.77m £1.45m £2.35m £2.60m £3.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £50.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.42m £1.58m £1.71m £2.23m £2.61m
Income - Other £36.55k £4.06k £9.97k £25.18k £3.36k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £804.00k £1.45m £1.07m £828.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds £731.63k £649.51k £903.20k £1.54m £2.66m
Expenditure - Governance £13.67k £14.33k £28.46k £0 £23.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £733.45k £559.67k £1.19m £0 £574.60k
Expenditure - Investment management £731.63k £649.51k £903.20k £0 £2.66m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £29.42m £29.71m £39.15m £41.06m £41.79m
Other assets £2.67m £2.74m £2.73m £830.23k £484.99k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £13.34m £13.45m £23.52m £23.89m £25.13m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
479 HOLLOWAY ROAD
LONDON
N7 6LE
Phone:
020 7272 2255
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available