SOUTH WONSTON INSTITUTE

Charity number: 266136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Furthering the work of the Church of England in the ecclesiastical parishes of Wonston and South Wonston, Hampshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £350
Total expenditure: £600

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 September 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Dr Robert Rees Trustee 19 October 2023
None on record
Melinda Jane Samms Trustee 31 March 2019
None on record
Dr SARAH LINDSAY HOBHOUSE Trustee 24 April 2016
THE BRENDONCARE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BRENDONCARE CLUBS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £205 £206 £210 £50 £350
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £600
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
94 Downs Road
South Wonston
WINCHESTER
Hampshire
SO21 3EW
Phone:
07851 694569
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available