Financial history THE DEVIZES HOSPITALS BROADCASTING SERVICE

Charity Number: 266172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £650 £160 £250 £25 £0
Total expenditure £990 £722 £670 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A