Financial history THE CANON LAW SOCIETY TRUST

Charity Number: 266263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £44.30k £41.18k £90.95k £115.26k £119.47k
Total expenditure £14.83k £31.99k £68.40k £130.29k £137.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A