THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE COUNCIL FOR A BEAUTIFUL ISRAEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds on behalf of the Council for a Beautiful Israel, a charity based in Israel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Israel
Governance
- 16 November 1973: Standard registration
- 11 March 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 11 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1060081 NEW ISRAEL FUND
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £10 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2024 | 346 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
TO MAKE GRANTS TO THE COUNCIL FOR A BEAUTIFUL ISRAEL FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ISRAEL BY RESTORATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF SYNAGOGUES MOSQUES AND CHURCHES: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ISRAEL BY PROVIDING ASSITANCE TO PERSONS IN NEED: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ISRAEL ON MATTERS CONCERNING THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND LANDSCAPE (WITH EMPHASIS ON THE PREVENTION OF POLLUTION) BY PLANNING THROUGH ALL PHASES FROM INFANT TO UNIVERSITY AND PROFESSIONAL LEVELS AND BY ENCOURAGING RESEARCH ON ENVIRONMENTAL PROBLEMS AND IMPROVEMENT OF SCHOOLS AND TECHNICAL COLLEGES.
Area of benefit
ISRAEL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window