THE LABAN GUILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Laban Guild is a charitable organisation founded in 1946 to promote and advance the study of Laban-based movement and dance. The first President was Rudolf Laban. The charity promotes courses, masterclasses and events, in a diverse number of venues and educational settings and our magazine Movement, Dance & Drama magazine is produced 6 times a year for members/subscribers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 April 1974: Standard registration
- LABAN GUILD INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- THE LABAN GUILD FOR MOVEMENT & DANCE (Working name)
- THE LABAN GUILD FOR MOVEMENT AND DANCE (Working name)
- THE LABAN ART OF MOVEMENT GUILD (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SARA PATRICIA MUNDELLA HOUSTON | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr CLARE MARIA LIDBURY | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|||||
DARREN LEE ROYSTON | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Mary Pamela Anderton | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.22k | £4.39k | £4.98k | £4.74k | £3.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.73k | £18.36k | £5.23k | £11.09k | £7.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH APRIL 1972 AND AMENDED 2ND MARCH 1974 AND 7TH MARCH 1981 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF HUMAN MOVEMENT PARTICULARLY RECOGNISING THE CONTRIBUTION MADE BY THE LATE RUDOLF LABAN AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO THE FOLLOWING SUBSIDIARY PURPOSES: A) TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE EXCHANGE OF IDEAS AND THE PROMULGATION OF KNOWLEDGE OF HUMAN MOVEMENT AND TO FOSTER AWARENESS OF THE SIGNIFICANCE OF MOVEMENT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE SPHERES OF DANCE PERFORMANCE, CHOREOGRAPHY, DANCE IN EDUCATION, RECREATIVE DANCE, DRAMA, THERAPY, ACTION PROFILING, PERSONALITY ASSESSMENT AND ERGONOMICS AS RECOGNISED AREAS OF LABAN’S WORK. B) TO ENCOURAGE AND PARTICIPATE IN RESEARCH INTO THE STUDY OF HUMAN MOVEMENT AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. C) TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF MOVEMENT AS AN ART FORM. D) TO PROMOTE LECTURES, COURSES, CONFERENCES AND DISCUSSION GROUPS TO IMPART A WIDER UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARTISTIC, CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL AND THERAPEUTIC SIGNIFICANCE OF THE ART OF MOVEMENT. E) TO PROMOTE LIVE DEMONSTRATIONS, FESTIVALS, RE-CREATIVE AND COMMUNITY DANCE GROUPS AND OTHER LIKE EXPOSITIONS. F) TO DO ALL SUCH MATTERS AND THINGS AS MAY APPEAR TO THE ORGANISATION TO BE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM BUT ONLY WITH THE APPROVAL AND CONFIRMATION OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 Blackborough Road
Reigate
RH2 7BY
- Phone:
- 07885540211
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window