Financial history TABEEL TRUST

Charity number: 266645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £23.74k £22.94k £21.11k £25.04k £23.31k
Total expenditure £142.98k £88.65k £99.57k £88.42k £117.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A