HOLLAND HOUSE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£2,002,152
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.93m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £73.67k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,770,656
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.77m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.77m | |
Retained for future use | £231.50k |
People

26 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 May 1974: Standard registration
- HOLLAND HOUSE SCHOOL IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET (Previous name)
- HOLLAND HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Safia Tharoo | Chair | 14 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Vivek Chohan | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sagar Shah | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Raxita Kantaria | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ketan Patel | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Parag Mehta | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
NEEL SHAH | Trustee | 17 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
KRISHNA MAJEETHIA | Trustee | 07 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN WILSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.45m | £1.50m | £1.61m | £1.78m | £2.00m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.42m | £1.41m | £1.46m | £1.63m | £1.77m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £1.43m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.39m | £0 | £1.55m | £1.71m | £1.93m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £59.80k | £56.45k | £56.08k | £64.83k | £73.67k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.42m | £1.41m | £1.46m | £1.63m | £1.77m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £10.24k | £0 | £0 | £24.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.39m | £1.34m | £1.29m | £1.23m | £1.21m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.90m | £2.05m | £2.04m | £1.98m | £2.35m | |
|
Other assets | £602.54k | £801.26k | £981.42k | £568.25k | £882.05k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.19m | £1.24m | £1.28m | £720.69k | £779.03k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 MARCH 1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 1975 AND 8 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO CONDUCT, CARRY ON, ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS OR COLLEGE OR COLLEGES FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS OF EITHER SEX OR BOTH SEXES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 BROADHURST AVENUE
EDGWARE
HA8 8TP
- Phone:
- 02089586979
- Email:
- bursar@hollandhouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window