THE KENSINGTON SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and improve the amenities of Kensington for the public benefit by stimulating interest in its history and records, promoting good architecture and planning in its future development and by protecting, preserving and improving its buildings, open spaces and other features of beauty or historic or public interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 17 July 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA WHITAKER FRAME | Chair | 02 April 2003 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES FAIRRIE | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Shayan Keyhan-Rad | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
BARRY MUNDAY | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
VANESSA BARTULOVIC | Trustee | 08 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Arnold Mishcon | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Blomberg | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Sophia Jane Lambert CB | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
HENRY PETERSON OBE | Trustee | 04 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL BECKET | Trustee | 04 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Frame CA | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL ERNEST BACH | Trustee | 20 May 1975 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.14k | £20.43k | £31.06k | £53.86k | £33.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.37k | £23.94k | £36.03k | £60.41k | £32.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST MAY 1974 AS AMENDED 11 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE AMENITIES OF KENSINGTON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY STIMULATING INTEREST IN ITS HISTORY AND RECORDS, PROMOTING GOOD ARCHITECTURE AND PLANNING IN ITS FUTURE DEVELOPMENT AND BY PROTECTING, PRESERVING AND IMPROVING ITS BUILDINGS, OPEN SPACES AND OTHER FEATURES OF BEAUTY OR HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
KENSINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Astwood Mews
London
SW7 4DE
- Phone:
- 07711519235
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window