READING CHRISTADELPHIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion according to Christadelphian beliefs based on the Bible. We have sought to achieve this aim by holding regular religious services, public talks, reading groups and Bible study seminars. We do not seek financial support from the general public. Apart from a small number of voluntary donations, all our funds are raised internally from our own membership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Reading
Governance
- 16 August 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hamidreza Omidwari | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David John Dunstan | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN WALKER | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|||||
David Benjamin Willey | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Philip James Noakes | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain James MacDonald | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Marc Eitel | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.47k | £38.49k | £36.70k | £42.39k | £42.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.68k | £28.26k | £41.10k | £49.18k | £41.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 20/10/1945 AS AMENDED ON 03/09/2014
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, ACCORDING TO CHRISTADELPHIAN BELIEFS, IN READING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE HOLDING OF REGULAR RELIGIOUS SERVICES, PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND STUDY EVENINGS; AND 2. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
READING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Falstaff Avenue
Earley
READING
RG6 5TQ
- Phone:
- 01189547182
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window