CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY IPSWICH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is to promote the writings and teachings of Mary Baker Eddy. The Church was founded to "reinstate primitive Christianity and it's lost element of healing" ( p.17 Church Manual of the 1st Church of Christ, Scientist in Boston ,Massachusetts, U.S.A. . Author:- Mary Baker Eddy ).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 September 1974: Standard registration
- 17 January 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, IPSWICH (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.36k | £4.09k | £2.15k | £1.69k | £724 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.15k | £5.69k | £2.46k | £5.24k | £5.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BY-LAWS ADOPTED ABOUT 1922 REVISED 1960, 1985, 1988 AND 24 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN AND SPREAD THE TRUTH AS SET FORTH IN THE BIBLE AND SCIENCE AND HEALTH WITH KEY TO THE SCRIPTURES BY MARY BAKER EDDY, THE DISCOVERER AND FOUNDER OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
IPSWICH
Linked charities
- 09 September 1974 : Standard registration
- 17 January 2024 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window