SOUTH LONDON THEATRE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, maintain, improve and advance the education of the public by the production of educational plays and encouragement of the arts, including the arts of drama, mime, dance, singing and music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
- Kent
- Lambeth
- Southwark
- Surrey
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 20 September 1974: Standard registration
- SLT (Working name)
- SLY THEATRE (Working name)
- SOUTH LONDON THEATRE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geraldine McAndrew OBE | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Marysia Skwarka | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Shree Ziradkar | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Gareth Simon John Milton | Trustee | 18 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Simon Gleisner | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER MACDONALD STOOKE | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.75k | £64.33k | £116.30k | £121.33k | £136.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.58k | £53.32k | £65.14k | £130.14k | £165.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH NOVEMBER 1967 AS AMENDED 13TH MARCH 1974 AND 9TH MAY 1974
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND ALL SECTIONS OF THE PUBLIC BY TH PRDUCTION OF EDUCATIONLA PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS , INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A NORWOOD HIGH STREET
LONDON
SE27 9NS
- Phone:
- 07701055602
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window