GLADSTONE DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer confidential advice in the following areas:Welfare benefits, Immigration & Asylum, Education, Consumer and General, Nationality, Indefinite leave to remain and appeals. We also offer English classes from Pre-entry Level to Level 2.Enrichment activities like yoga classes, coach trips, sewing classes and flower arranging courses are also offered.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £36,030 from 1 government contract(s) and £272,259 from 6 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 27 June 1975: Standard registration
- GLADCA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Beasley | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|||||
SNIEGUOLE MALIAVSKAJA | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Israr Khan | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|||||
SALMAN KHAN | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD NAWAZ | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anamika GhoSh | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Karen Igho | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD AFZAL | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOHAMMED YOUSAF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mohammed Jamil | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.17k | £310.95k | £316.63k | £290.67k | £319.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.32k | £235.84k | £284.93k | £281.49k | £301.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £26.78k | £93.02k | £80.74k | £36.03k | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.35k | £10.00k | £93.02k | £80.74k | £272.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTUTION ADOPTED 14TH MAY 1974 AND AMENDED 6TH JUNE 1975, 29TH JUNE 1989 AND 26TH JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE GLADSTONE DISTRICT OF PETERBOROUGH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIM OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GLADSTONE DISTRICT OF PETERBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
316-318 Gladstone Street
Peterborough
Cambs
PE1 2BX
- Phone:
- 01733 566343
- Email:
- info@gladca.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window