Financial history EASTERN AREA ASSOCIATION OF THE CONGREGATIONAL FEDERATION

Charity Number: 268445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £500 £500 £0 £524 £0
Total expenditure £354 £354 £373 £10 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A