SUSSEX COUNTY ASSOCIATION OF CHANGE RINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the ringing of church bells to call people to worship. Providing grants for restoring, maintaining, improving or preserving church bells in Sussex for ringing in churches. Providing training and skill development grants to young people learning change ringing on tower or hand bells. Encouraging the recruitment and training of all ringers and advancing the art of change ringing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1042 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 13 December 1974: Standard registration
- SUSSEX CHURCHES BELL RESTORATION FUND (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Reginald Spencer | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARK ANDREW DAWKINS | Trustee | 06 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Peter Jonathan Franklin | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.56k | £15.74k | £14.30k | £17.63k | £31.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.71k | £9.23k | £11.11k | £39.50k | £20.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 12/10/1974 AS AMENDED 12/05/1984 as amended on 13 May 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO BE OF SERVICE TO THE CHURCH IN THE COUNTY OF SUSSEX WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS SHALL: (A) FOSTER RINGING FOR DIVINE SERVICE (B) ENCOURAGE THE RECRUITMENT AND TRAINING OF LEARNERS AND ADVANCE THE ART OF CHANGERINGING (C) PRESERVE BELLS FROM REDUNDANT CHURCHES AND RESTORE, MAINTAIN OR IMPROVE EXISTING PEALS OF BELLS AND TOWERS AND BELFRIES HOUSING THEM (E) LOYALLY ABIDE BY THE RULES AND DECISIONS OF THE CENTRAL COUNCIL OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF SUSSEX WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Southdown Terrace
Steyning
BN44 3YJ
- Phone:
- 07876 237007
- Email:
- treasurer@scacr.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window