THE REDLAND AND COTHAM AMENITIES SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to protect and enhance our area, its architecture, trees, parks and amenities, for present and future residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
Governance
- 28 January 1975: Standard registration
- R C A S (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie Gallop | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dunscombe | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|||||
ALISON NINA WHITAKER BROMILOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.97k | £7.00k | £10.79k | £8.64k | £7.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £5.78k | £10.91k | £11.59k | £4.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £100 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 1973
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PRESENT AND FUTURE COMMUNITY OF REDLAND AND COTHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME AND IN PARTICULAR TO FURTHER THE MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE CULTURAL ARCHITECTURAL AND OTHER AMENITIES OF THE SAID NEIGHBOURHOOD AND ALSO TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHE LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR THE PRESENT AND FUTURE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
REDLAND, COTHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
15A Archfield Road
BRISTOL
BS6 6BD
- Phone:
- 07730019104
- Email:
- peterdunscombe@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window