THE YOUNG VIC COMPANY

Charity number: 268876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the Charity are to create high quality, innovative and imaginative theatre for a wide and, in particular, young audience. The creation and presentation of high quality performances in unique adaptable auditoria, with far-reaching education and access policies, is achieved through a combination of box office revenue, public subsidy and fundraising.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 1975: Standard registration
  • 14 January 2016: Funds received from 1042802 THE BURFORD CANNELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE YOUNG VIC COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GLENN EARLE Chair 17 October 2018
None on record
Joshua Parr Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
Layla Madanat Trustee 04 May 2023
NATIONAL STUDENT DRAMA FESTIVAL LIMITED
Received: 59 days late
Andrea Jain Cee Lee Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
Farah Ramzan Golant Trustee 28 May 2021
None on record
Kobina Kuttah Holdbrook-Smith Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Dr Robert James Campbell Easton Trustee 13 July 2017
CANCER RESEARCH UK
Received: On time
Ali Hossaini Trustee 13 July 2017
None on record
Nicola Ann Dunn Trustee 18 October 2016
None on record
Anna Elizabeth Williams Trustee 18 October 2016
None on record
Fiona Mary Shaw Trustee 18 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.77m £6.48m £6.72m £7.80m £7.18m
Total expenditure £7.30m £4.07m £7.11m £10.27m £6.50m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.01m £3.87m £982.84k £5.00k £16.45k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.31m £2.30m £4.27m £3.08m £4.05m
Income - Other trading activities £285.36k £153.36k £340.94k £10.13k £1.58k
Income - Charitable activities £3.11m £4.03m £2.01m £3.31m £2.72m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £3.50k £9.02k
Income - Other £72.27k £0 £110.68k £1.39m £400.26k
Income - Legacies £0 £1.10m £48.25k £30.00k £55.07k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.89m £3.67m £6.76m £9.69m £6.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £345.38k £268.85k £345.47k £573.87k £458.25k
Expenditure - Governance £30.55k £0 £84.22k £84.63k £44.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £60.81k £128.34k £6.07k £4.50k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £8.99m £8.70m £8.68m £8.32m £8.01m
Long-term investments £0 £1 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.98m £4.50m £4.09m £3.17m £2.72m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.60m £1.42m £1.37m £2.56m £1.12m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 February 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 February 2023 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
66 THE CUT
LONDON
SE1 8LZ
Phone:
02079222800