TERRITORIAL ARMY RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organised shooting competitions and training for the Army Reserve. Administered the AR representative shooting teams. These activities have been handed over to the SASC and ARA.TARA is amalgamating with the ARA and will cease to exist in 2016
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Total income includes £19,578 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 April 1975: Standard registration
- 12 December 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 December 2016: Funds transferred to 227639 ARMY RIFLE ASSOCIATION
- TARA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.58k | £51.67k | £50.59k | £47.25k | £35.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.31k | £46.91k | £47.15k | £55.66k | £116.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 27 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 27 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 29 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 29 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 22 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 22 July 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 03 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 03 September 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 10TH JULY 1973 AS AMENDED 1ST JULY 1994
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ENCOURAGE SKILL IN RIFLE AND OTHER SMALL ARMS SHOOTING AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY SO THAT THEY WILL BE BETTER FITTED TO SERVE THEIR COUNTRY IN THE TERRITORIAL ARMY OR OTHER ARMED FORCES IN WHICH THEIR SERVICES MAY BE REQUIRED IN TIMES OF PERIL AND PARTICULARLY IN SUCH METHODS AS WILL LEAD TO EFFICIENCY ON THE BATTLEFIELD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window