Financial history VILLAGE HALL - EAST BRENT

Charity number: 269419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.28k £4.14k £16.30k £23.82k £19.71k
Total expenditure £8.75k £4.72k £13.38k £11.63k £6.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.09k N/A N/A £6.55k N/A