Financial history CLARKES MUSIC SERVICES TRUST

Charity number: 269579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £381 £185 £189 £192 £193
Total expenditure £310 £110 £110 £110 £110
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A